TX HB2795 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the offense of solicitation of prostitution and certain other consequences of that offense; increasing a criminal penalty; making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the offense of solicitation of prostitution and certain other consequences of that offense; increasing a criminal penalty; making conforming changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1176
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback