TX HB2793 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to parole determinations and individual treatment plans for inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to parole determinations and individual treatment plans for inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1053 (Y: 83 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1053
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Corrections
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback