TX HB2787 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to repeal of certain Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 exemption provisions relating to pharmacy benefits.
Title
Relating to repeal of certain Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 exemption provisions relating to pharmacy benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#506 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#473 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#473 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#506 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#473 |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB844 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee