TX HB2781 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Co-sponsor authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Co-sponsor authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for an aggravated assault occurring as part of a mass shooting; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for an aggravated assault occurring as part of a mass shooting; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#627 (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#627 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Weapons
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Weapons