TX HB2778 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of the State Office of Administrative Hearings.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1432 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1432 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
SB1432 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, TEXAS DEPT. OF INSURANCE
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
VIDEOCONFERENCING
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, TEXAS DEPT. OF INSURANCE
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
VIDEOCONFERENCING