TX HB2770 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to emergency response employees or volunteers and others exposed or potentially exposed to certain diseases or parasites.
Title
Relating to emergency response employees or volunteers and others exposed or potentially exposed to certain diseases or parasites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VOLUNTEERS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VOLUNTEERS