TX HB277 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to capital murder of a prosecuting attorney or an assistant prosecuting attorney.
Title
Relating to capital murder of a prosecuting attorney or an assistant prosecuting attorney.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Stuart Spitzer [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB277 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00277I.htm |