TX HB2769 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum for public school students.
Title
Relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum for public school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1153 (Y: 91 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1153 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Science & Technology
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Science & Technology