TX HB2769 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authorization by referendum on an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the authorization by referendum on an optional county fee on vehicle registration in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
County Government
County Government--Finance
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
County Government
County Government--Finance
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration