TX HB2767 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sharing of controlled substance prescription monitoring information between the Texas State Board of Pharmacy and the Health and Human Services Commission for the state Medicaid program.
Title
Relating to the sharing of controlled substance prescription monitoring information between the Texas State Board of Pharmacy and the Health and Human Services Commission for the state Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1187 (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1187 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-27 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Crimes--Drugs
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF