TX HB2762 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to broker agreements for the sale of certain surplus property by certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to broker agreements for the sale of certain surplus property by certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1785 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-25HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-27HouseReferred to County Affairs
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback