TX HB276 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation by a municipality or property owners' association of food production on single-family residential lots.
Title
Relating to the regulation by a municipality or property owners' association of food production on single-family residential lots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#711 (Y: 125 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#665 (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#665 (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#711 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#665 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
FOOD
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Animals
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
FOOD
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association