TX HB275 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an application for a writ of habeas corpus based on certain relevant scientific evidence that was not available at the applicant's trial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an application for a writ of habeas corpus based on certain relevant scientific evidence that was not available at the applicant's trial.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#394 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-22HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-22HouseRecord vote RV#394
2021-04-22HousePassed
2021-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-21HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback