TX HB2748 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Postponed 7/4/19 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulation of the retail sale of fireworks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of the retail sale of fireworks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HousePostponed 7/4/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-08HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(d)
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-08HousePostponed 5/8/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-01HousePostponed 5/8/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-01HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-30HousePostponed 5/1/19 8:00 AM
2019-04-30HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-30HousePostponed 4/30/19 8:45 PM
2019-04-30HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-30HousePostponed 4/30/19 8:00 PM
2019-04-30HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-25HousePostponed 4/30/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-23HousePostponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-11HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback