TX HB2746 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability for the additional tax imposed on land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land in the event of a change of use of the land if the land is transferred to a charitable organization for purposes of building housing for sale without profit to a low-income individual or family.
Title
Relating to liability for the additional tax imposed on land appraised for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land in the event of a change of use of the land if the land is transferred to a charitable organization for purposes of building housing for sale without profit to a low-income individual or family.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-05-12 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-10 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-10 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Amended | |
2011-05-10 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-10 | Postponed | |
2011-05-10 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-09 | Postponed | |
2011-05-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Housing
Housing--General
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Housing
Housing--General
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions