TX HB2743 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the salary of certain employees who transfer within a state agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the salary of certain employees who transfer within a state agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#801 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-11SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#801
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback