TX HB2742 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reentry and reintegration programs provided by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to the reentry and reintegration programs provided by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1051 (Y: 73 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1051 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF