TX HB2737 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notifying an alleged perpetrator of child abuse or neglect of the person's rights in connection with an investigation conducted by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to notifying an alleged perpetrator of child abuse or neglect of the person's rights in connection with an investigation conducted by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB647 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services