TX HB2735 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to security required before filing suit against a groundwater conservation district.
Title
Relating to security required before filing suit against a groundwater conservation district.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1101 (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Amended RV#1065 (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Amended RV#1065 (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#1101 |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#1065 |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-04 | House | Amended 1-T. King |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Courts--Civil Procedure
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.