TX HB2733 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to defendants restricted to the operation of a vehicle equipped with an ignition interlock device or required to submit to alcohol monitoring and establishing a central database of those defendants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to defendants restricted to the operation of a vehicle equipped with an ignition interlock device or required to submit to alcohol monitoring and establishing a central database of those defendants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#626 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#626
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-29HouseAmended 2-Tinderholt
2021-04-29HouseAmended 1-Tinderholt
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-21HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2021-04-21HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback