TX HB2732 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited reporting of information regarding debt incurred for nonemergency medical care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited reporting of information regarding debt incurred for nonemergency medical care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback