TX HB2730 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the acquisition of real property by an entity with eminent domain authority and the regulation of easement or right-of-way agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the acquisition of real property by an entity with eminent domain authority and the regulation of easement or right-of-way agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1026 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Read 2nd time RV#997 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 1/1/22
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-18SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-05-18SenateRead first time
2021-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1026
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#997
2021-05-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2730
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02730I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02730H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02730E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02730S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02730F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02730I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02730H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02730H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02730E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02730E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2730&RcdVtNo=997&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2730&RcdVtNo=1026&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=236

Bill Comments 750

feedback