TX HB2728 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of January 27 as International Holocaust Remembrance Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of January 27 as International Holocaust Remembrance Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#851 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-11SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#851
2021-05-07HousePassed
2021-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-06HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-20HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2728
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02728I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02728E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02728S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02728F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02728I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02728H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02728E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02728E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2728&RcdVtNo=851&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=63

Bill Comments 750

feedback