TX HB2727 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of home telemonitoring services under Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of home telemonitoring services under Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2171 (Y: 120 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#607 (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Amended RV#570 (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-13 Effective immediately
2023-06-13 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2023-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2023-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#2171
2023-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2023-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2023-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2023-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2023-05-24SenateRecord vote
2023-05-24SenatePassed
2023-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-24SenateRecord vote
2023-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2023-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-24SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2023-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2023-05-19SenateVote taken in committee
2023-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-05-02SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2023-05-02SenateRead first time
2023-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2023-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2023-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#607
2023-04-27HousePassed
2023-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#570
2023-04-26HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2023-04-26HouseAmended 1-Price
2023-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2023-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2023-03-13HouseRead first time
2023-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2727
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02727I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02727H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02727E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02727S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02727F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/amendments/html/HB02727H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02727I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02727H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB02727H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB02727E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02727E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02727S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/HB02727S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02727A.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02727F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2727&RcdVtNo=570&Ch=H&Dt=04/26/2023
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2727&RcdVtNo=607&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2023
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2727&RcdVtNo=2171&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2023
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-24-F1.PDF#page=31

Bill Comments

feedback