TX HB2726 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the commencement of construction of a project following the issuance of a draft permit for a permit amendment to an air quality permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the commencement of construction of a project following the issuance of a draft permit for a permit amendment to an air quality permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1992 (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1040 (Y: 102 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1020 (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 1/1/20
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1992
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateAmended
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1040
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#1020
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended 1325
2019-05-06HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-01HousePostponed 5/6/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-01HouseAmended 1-Zedler
2019-05-01HouseMotion to table fails 1-Zedler
2019-05-01HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Zedler
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1501 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2726
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02726I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02726H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02726E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02726S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02726F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2726&RcdVtNo=1020&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2726&RcdVtNo=1040&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=42
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=43
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2726&RcdVtNo=1992&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=51

Bill Comments

feedback