TX HB272 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a state financing program administered by the Texas Public Finance Authority to assist school districts with certain expenses; granting authority to issue bonds or other obligations.
Title
Relating to the creation of a state financing program administered by the Texas Public Finance Authority to assist school districts with certain expenses; granting authority to issue bonds or other obligations.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Koop [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-08-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-08-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-08-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-08-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-07-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS