TX HB2715 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Transportation on shared motor-assisted scooters.
Title
Relating to a study by the Texas Department of Transportation on shared motor-assisted scooters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1123 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1123 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
TEXAS A&M TRANSPORTATION INSTITUTE
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
TEXAS A&M TRANSPORTATION INSTITUTE
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General