TX HB271 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the Veterans Recovery Pilot Program to provide certain veterans with hyperbaric oxygen treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the Veterans Recovery Pilot Program to provide certain veterans with hyperbaric oxygen treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1346 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#231 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-19SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-18HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-11HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-10HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateAmended
2017-05-10SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10SenateLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-10SenatePostponed
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-04-19SenateRead first time
2017-04-18SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12HouseRecord vote
2017-04-12HousePassed
2017-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-11HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback