TX HB2708 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Texas Department of Transportation for certain employees responding to emergencies or disasters.
Title
Relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Texas Department of Transportation for certain employees responding to emergencies or disasters.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-04-17 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 537 |
2019-04-10 | House | Postponed 4/17/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB537 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
FOOD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
FOOD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous