TX HB2703 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a work group on the establishment of a maternal mortality and morbidity data registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a work group on the establishment of a maternal mortality and morbidity data registry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback