TX HB2701 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement that individuals joining the Texas National Guard sign a notice regarding active combat duty.
Title
Relating to the requirement that individuals joining the Texas National Guard sign a notice regarding active combat duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Slaton [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Jeff Cason [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |