TX HB270 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the personal needs allowance for certain Medicaid recipients who are residents of long-term care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the personal needs allowance for certain Medicaid recipients who are residents of long-term care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#362 (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#351 (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#362
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#351
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback