TX HB27 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for assault or aggravated assault of a federal law enforcement officer.
Title
Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for assault or aggravated assault of a federal law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#147 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-03 | House | Record vote RV#147 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aliens
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement