TX HB2697 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of fraudulent use or possession of identifying information.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of fraudulent use or possession of identifying information.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#584 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#584 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#584 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee