TX HB2695 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipalities that adopt budgets that defund municipal police departments.
Title
Relating to municipalities that adopt budgets that defund municipal police departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Law Enforcement
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
Law Enforcement