TX HB2688 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the term of office for certain trustees of an independent school district.
Title
Relating to the term of office for certain trustees of an independent school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts