TX HB2683 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to remote and other meetings held under the open meetings law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to remote and other meetings held under the open meetings law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Amended RV#386 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Amended RV#353 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#386
2021-04-21HousePassed as amended
2021-04-21HouseAmended 1-C. Bell
2021-04-21HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-04-21HousePostponed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20HouseRecord vote RV#353
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-20HouseAmended 2-Cason
2021-04-20HouseAmended 1-Howard
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB924 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2683
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02683I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02683H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02683E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02683H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02683H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02683H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02683I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02683H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02683H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2683&RcdVtNo=353&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2683&RcdVtNo=386&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback