TX HB2681 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school elective courses providing academic study of the Bible offered to certain students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school elective courses providing academic study of the Bible offered to certain students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1677 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1182 (Y: 119 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Passed RV#1180 (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective immediately
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1677
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1182
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2681
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02681I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02681H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02681E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02681S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02681F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02681I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02681H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02681E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02681E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02681S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02681S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02681F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2681&RcdVtNo=1180&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2681&RcdVtNo=1182&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2681&RcdVtNo=1677&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=134

Bill Comments 750

feedback