TX HB2680 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain procedures relating to children placed under a parental child safety placement.
Title
Relating to certain procedures relating to children placed under a parental child safety placement.
Sponsors
Rep. Lacey Hull [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#378 (Y: 136 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#378 |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended 2-Hinojosa, Noble, Frank, and Neave |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended 1-Hull |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |