TX HB2680 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allocation of money from the law enforcement officer standards and education fund.
Title
Relating to allocation of money from the law enforcement officer standards and education fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 2680Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Finances
State Finances--Budget
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Finances
State Finances--Budget