TX HB2680 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for certain small local exchange companies to propose to offer certain services or to make a minor change in a rate or tariff.
Title
Relating to the procedure for certain small local exchange companies to propose to offer certain services or to make a minor change in a rate or tariff.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-10 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-10 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-10 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-03 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-03 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-19 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |