TX HB2677 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain restrictions on contributions and expenditures from political funds by a lobbyist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain restrictions on contributions and expenditures from political funds by a lobbyist.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1006 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 27, 2019
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#1006
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-02HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-02HouseAmended 1-Goldman
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback