TX HB2671 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the placement of certain substances in Penalty Groups 1 and 3 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act and the prosecution of criminal offenses involving certain substances listed in Penalty Groups 1, 2, and 3 of that Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the placement of certain substances in Penalty Groups 1 and 3 of the Texas Controlled Substances Act and the prosecution of criminal offenses involving certain substances listed in Penalty Groups 1, 2, and 3 of that Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1802 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#594 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#575 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HousePassed
2017-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01HouseRecord vote
2017-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-30HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-22HouseRead first time
2017-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2671
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02671I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02671H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02671E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02671S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02671F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2671&RcdVtNo=575&Ch=H&Dt=05/01/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2671&RcdVtNo=594&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2671&RcdVtNo=1802&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=78

Bill Comments

feedback