TX HB2667 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to universal service fund assistance to high cost rural areas and the uniform charge that funds the universal service fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to universal service fund assistance to high cost rural areas and the uniform charge that funds the universal service fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1644 (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Remarks ordered printed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#657 (Y: 127 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - Amended RV#645 (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1644
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-05-25SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#657
2021-05-04HousePassed as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Ashby
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#645
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-03HouseAmended 1-Rodriguez
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2667
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02667I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02667H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02667E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02667S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02667F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02667H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02667H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02667I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02667H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02667H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02667E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02667E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02667S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02667S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02667F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2667&RcdVtNo=645&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2667&RcdVtNo=657&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=92
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=102
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2667&RcdVtNo=1644&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback