TX HB2667 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the abolishment of certain programs administered by the Texas Economic Development Bank.
Title
Relating to the abolishment of certain programs administered by the Texas Economic Development Bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2667Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Corporations & Associations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Corporations & Associations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--Rural
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES