TX HB2664 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an independent school district to change the date of the general election and terms for officers.
Title
Relating to the authority of an independent school district to change the date of the general election and terms for officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 118 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1049 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-12 | House | Amended 1-Martinez and Schofield |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |