TX HB2662 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact waste disposal facility; reducing a surcharge; eliminating a fee.
Title
Relating to the Texas Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact waste disposal facility; reducing a surcharge; eliminating a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1793 (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#883 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#883 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE
LOW-LEVEL RADIOACTIVE WASTE DISPOSAL COMPACT COMMISSION, TEXAS
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE OVERSIGHT COMMITTEE
LOW-LEVEL RADIOACTIVE WASTE DISPOSAL COMPACT COMMISSION, TEXAS