TX HB2660 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the jurisdiction and management of the Star of the Republic Museum by the Texas Historical Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the jurisdiction and management of the Star of the Republic Museum by the Texas Historical Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#297 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15 Effective immediately
2021-05-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-03SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-03HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-04-20SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#297
2021-04-16HousePassed
2021-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-16HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB881 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2660
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02660I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02660S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02660F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02660I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02660H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02660E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02660E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2660&RcdVtNo=297&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments

feedback