TX HB2652 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing an advisory board to study surface water and groundwater interaction.
Title
Relating to establishing an advisory board to study surface water and groundwater interaction.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1039 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Governor
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Legislature
SENATE, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
SURFACE WATER & GROUNDWATER INTERACTION ADVISORY BOARD
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Governor
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Legislature
SENATE, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
SURFACE WATER & GROUNDWATER INTERACTION ADVISORY BOARD
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General