TX HB2647 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the authority to curtail groundwater production from wells used for power generation or mining.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the authority to curtail groundwater production from wells used for power generation or mining.
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - HB 2647Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Mines & Mineral Resources
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
WATER
Water--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
WATER
Water--General